► Current Committee Members 10.5 (Update on 2024.09.05)
Term |
Minister / Executive Secretary |
Members |
Effective Date |
---|---|---|---|
2023.08.01-2025.07.31 | Shuu-Jiun Wang / Shih-Hwa Chiou | 10.4 | 2024.08.05 |
Shuu-Jiun Wang / Shih-Hwa Chiou | 10.3 | 2024.01.30 | |
Shuu-Jiun Wang / Shih-Hwa Chiou | 10.2 | 2023.10.25 | |
Shuu-Jiun Wang / Shih-Hwa Chiou | 10.1 | 2023.08.04 | |
2021.08.01-2023.07.31 | Ming-Chih Hou / Shih-Hwa Chiou | 9.2 | 2022.03.02 |
Ming-Chih Hou / Shih-Hwa Chiou | 9.1 | 2021.07.30 | |
2019.08.01-2021.07.31 | Ming-Chih Hou / Shih-Hwa Chiou | 8.3 | 2021.03.04 |
Shou-Yen Kao / Shih-Hwa Chiou | 8.2 | 2020.01.16 | |
Shou-Yen Kao / Shih-Hwa Chiou | 8.1 | 2019.08.29 | |
2017.08.01-2019.07.31 |
Shou-Yen Kao / Shih-Hwa Chiou |
7.3 |
2019.04.02 |
Shou-Yen Kao / Shih-Hwa Chiou |
7.2 |
2019.01.19 |
|
Shinn-Jang Hwang / Jaw-Ching Wu |
7.1 |
2017.08.07 |
|
2015.08.01-2017.07.31 |
Shung-Tai Ho / Shing-Jong Lin |
6.2 |
2016.01.11 |
Fa-Yauh Lee / Shing-Jong Lin |
6.1 |
2015.08.05 |
|
2013.08.01-2015.07.31 |
Fa-Yauh Lee / Shing-Jong Lin |
5.4 |
2015.02.04 |
Shung-Tai Ho / Shing-Jong Lin |
5.3 |
2014.04.29 |
|
Shung-Tai Ho / Shing-Jong Lin |
5.2 |
2013.12.31 |
|
Shung-Tai Ho / Shing-Jong Lin |
5.1 |
2013.08.01 |
|
2011.08.01-2013.07.31 |
Shung-Tai Ho / Shing-Jong Lin |
4.4 |
2013.03.01 |
Shung-Tai Ho / Shing-Jong Lin |
4.3 |
2012.07.31 |
|
Tung-Ping Su / Shing-Jong Lin |
4.2 |
2012.04.12 |
|
Tung-Ping Su / Shing-Jong Lin |
4.1 |
2011.08.01 |
|
2009.08 – 2011.07 |
Chen-Hsen Lee / Shing-Jong Lin |
03 |
2009.08 |
2007.08 – 2009.07 |
Chen-Hsen Lee / Low-Tone Ho |
02 |
2007.08 |
2004.10 – 2007.07 |
Chen-Hsen Lee / Jheng-Dian Guo |
01 |
2004.10 |
最後更新: